CA AB2249 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7094, 9272, 30459.2, 32472, 40212, 41172, 43523, 45868, 46623, 50156.12, 55333, and 60632 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Tax administration: Taxpayers' Rights Advocate: levy or notice to withhold: return of funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30459.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 32472 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 40212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 43523 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 45868 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 46623 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 50156.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 55040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 55333 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7094 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 9272 | Amended Code | Citation Text |