CA AB2244 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65913.6 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Religious institution affiliated housing: place of worship.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2244 Wicks (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2244 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2244 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4573.). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5019.) |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65913.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |