CA AB2238 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 990, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 990, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56668, 65584.01, and 65584.04 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 101080 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to local hazard management.
Title
Local agency formation: regional housing need allocation: fire hazards: local health emergencies: hazardous and medical waste.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2238 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2238 Aguiar-Curry By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2238 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2238 Aguiar-Curry By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2238 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 990, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 7030.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6008.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5130.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 56668 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65584.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65584.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66474.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 101080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |