CA AB2230 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 317, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 660, 663a, 2030.300, 2031.310, and 2033.290 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2230 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2230 Berman et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2230 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 317, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-10 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6645.).
2018-08-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5660.).
2018-08-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-06SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-07-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-06-25SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5208.)
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-12AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-14AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback