CA AB2230 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 317, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 317, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 660, 663a, 2030.300, 2031.310, and 2033.290 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2230 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2230 Berman et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2230 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2230 Berman et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2230 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 317, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6645.). |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5660.). |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5208.) |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 170.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2030.300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2031.310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2033.290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 437 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 663 | Amended Code | Citation Text |