CA AB2230 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1063.5 and 1063.74 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: Workers' Comp Bond Fund: assessments.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2230 Cooley By Roth (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 2230 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 2230 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4021.). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 4713.) |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1063.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1063.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1063.74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |