CA AB2220 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 5475) of Part 1 of Division 5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to courts, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Homeless Courts Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5475 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |