CA AB2218 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19855 and 19858 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Gambling: licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2218 BURKE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2218 Burke By Hall (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 2218 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2218 Burke By Hall (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 2218 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6544.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 7. Page 6553.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6474.) |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5422.). |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4357.) |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19858 | Amended Code | Citation Text |