CA AB2217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 10.4 (commencing with Section 20400) of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: Bridget “Biddy” Mason Golden State Credit Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2217 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2217 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5469.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.88.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 20400 | New Code | See Bill Text |