CA AB2205 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 563, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 563, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1347.8 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10127.20 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
California Health Benefit Exchange: abortion services coverage reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2205 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2205 Carrillo et al. By Limón (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2205 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2205 Carrillo et al. By Limón (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2205 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 563, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 13.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5126.). |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 4920.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1347.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10127.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |