CA AB2202 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 17568.8 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to short-term rentals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Short-term rentals: disclosure: cleaning tasks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2202 Rendon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2202 Rendon et al. By Laird (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2202 Rendon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2024.
2024-09-24 Approved by the Governor.
2024-09-05 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2024-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.).
2024-08-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2024-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2024-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4.).
2024-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2024-08-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15).
2024-07-01SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2024-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2024-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2024-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5428.)
2024-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 16).
2024-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2024-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-04-02AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2024-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2024-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2024-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2024-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2024-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code17568.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback