CA AB2197 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4456.5 and 4463 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 4456, 5201, 5202, 5901, and 40610 of, and to add Sections 1686 and 4456.6 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: temporary license plates.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 21). |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 40610 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 4456 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 4456.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4463 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 5201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 5202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 5901 | New Code | See Bill Text |