CA AB2190 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 734, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 734, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1601, 1602, and 1603 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 5354 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Criminal defendants: gravely disabled persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2190 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB2190 Maienschein By Hernandez (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2190 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB2190 Maienschein By Hernandez (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2190 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 734, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6616.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6631.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 4902.). |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5265.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5354 | Amended Code | Citation Text |