CA AB2182 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12920, 12921, 12926, and 12940 of, and to add Section 12940.5 to, the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Discrimination: family responsibilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12940.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |