CA AB2181 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10106, 10107, and 10108 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
State Contract Act: contracting by state agencies.
Sponsors
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2181 Hagman By Harman (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2181 HAGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2181 HAGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m. | |
2010-08-11 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 4452.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-17 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 3. Page 5190.) | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |