CA AB2179 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 863, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10061 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to utility service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal corporations: public utility service: water and sewer service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2179 GIPSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2179 Gipson By Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2179 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 863, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-28AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 2.).
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5589.).
2018-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-15SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and GOV. & F.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 5373.)
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code10061Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback