CA AB2178 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2168 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physicians and surgeons: special faculty permits: academic medical center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2178 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2178 Bloom By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2178 Bloom Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2178 Bloom By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2178 Bloom Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5121.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4658.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2168 | Amended Code | Citation Text |