CA AB2165 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1010.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic filing and service of documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2165 Robert Rivas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-12AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
2020-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1010.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback