CA AB2148 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 146 and 6501 of, and to add Section 6544 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 60.1, 1510, 1821, 2250, 2614.7, 2643.1, and 15604 of, to add Part 9.5 (commencing with Section 310) to Division 2 of, and to repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 2340) of Chapter 4 of Part 4 of Division 4 of, the Probate Code, relating to professional fiduciaries.
Title
Professional fiduciaries.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2148 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2148 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5426.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6544 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Probate Code | 1510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 15604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 1821 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2340 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2614.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2643.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Probate Code | 60.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |