CA AB2131 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23153 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Minimum franchise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |