CA AB2123 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 277, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 277, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10010 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
District-based elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2123 Cervantes By Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2123 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2123 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 277, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5438.). |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 3. Page 5128.) |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 8). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 11). |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 10010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |