CA AB2101 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 4366 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to caregivers.
Title
Caregiver resource centers: volunteer workforce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4366 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9118.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |