CA AB210 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 149.2 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High-occupancy vehicle lanes: County of Los Angeles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB210 Gatto By Liu (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 210 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-15 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2015-09-28 Vetoed by Governor.
2015-09-16AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2015-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2456.).
2015-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
2015-07-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1705.)
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-04-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2015-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-02-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2015-02-03AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
2015-02-02AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code149.2Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_210&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_210_bill_20150202_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_210_bill_20150909_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_210_vote_20150323_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_210_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_210_vote_20150601_0139PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_210_vote_20150623_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_210_vote_20150706_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_210_vote_20150827_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_210_vote_20150903_1200PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback