CA AB2098 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 938, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 938, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2270 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physicians and surgeons: unprofessional conduct.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Akilah Weber [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2098 Low et al. By Pan (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2098 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2098 Low et al. By Pan (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2098 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2098 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2098 Low et al. By Pan (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2098 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 938, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 20.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 5236.). |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 20.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11). |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 19). |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2270 | New Code | See Bill Text |