CA AB2098 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 3042 of the Family Code, relating to child custody.
Title
Child custody: preferences of child.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 3042 | Amended Code | Citation Text |