CA AB2098 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 163, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 163, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1170.9 of, and to add Section 1170.91 to, the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Military personnel: veterans: sentencing: mitigating circumstances.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Assembly - AB 2098 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent #17 AB2098 Levine By Roth (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Assembly - AB 2098 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent #17 AB2098 Levine By Roth (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Assembly - AB 2098 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 163, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5734.). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4146.). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4359.) |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1). |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 190.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |