CA AB2095 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 1415) to Part 4 of Division 2 of the Labor Code, and to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to private employment.
Title
Employment information: worker metrics.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1415 | New Code | See Bill Text |