CA AB2092 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 13 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6414 to the Labor Code, relating to emergency ambulance employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency ambulance employees: subsidized protective gear.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2092 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 2).
2020-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
2020-02-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code6414New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback