CA AB2087 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 987.53 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans' farm and home purchases: definition: home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2087 Torres By Denham (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2087 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2087 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4801.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14). | |
2010-07-15 | In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2010-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5407.) | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-20 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-19 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2010-04-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |