CA AB2081 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 480, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 480, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 71611.5 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Municipal water districts: water service: Indian lands.
Sponsors
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] |
Asm. James Ramos [D] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2081 Eduardo Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2081 Eduardo Garcia et al By Jones (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2081 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2081 Eduardo Garcia et al By Jones (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2081 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 480, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4988.). |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4512.) |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 71611.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |