CA AB2070 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2000 of, and to add Section 2001 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: compulsory voting.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2070 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2070 |