CA AB2066 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12715 of the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming.
Title
Tribal gaming: local agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2066 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2066 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4964.) |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12715 | Amended Code | Citation Text |