CA AB2065 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1170.45 of, and to add Sections 745.1, 2069, and 13012.3 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal justice records.
Title
Criminal justice records: offender data.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13012.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2069 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 745.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |