CA AB2064 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66025.4 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: tuition and mandatory systemwide fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66025.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |