CA AB2062 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on August 6 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 92.3 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State highways: landscaping.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 2062 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2062 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2062 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2018-08-06AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5038.).
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-12SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4644.)
2018-04-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-03-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2018-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code92.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback