CA AB2049 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 5574.) Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 35. Noes 33. Page 5590.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 5574.) Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 35. Noes 33. Page 5590.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 1746) to Chapter 10.5 of Part 2 of Division 2 of the Water Code, relating to the State Water Resources Development System.
Title
Transfers of water: agricultural use to municipal use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 2049 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 2049 ARAMBULA Motion to Reconsider (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2049 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Assembly - AB 2049 ARAMBULA Motion to Reconsider (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2049 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 5574.) Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 35. Noes 33. Page 5590.) | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 38. Noes 31. Page 5529.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Arambula. | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-20 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-19 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 13). | |
2010-03-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |