CA AB2047 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44259 and 44320.2 of, and to add and repeal Section 44299 of, the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher credentialing: teaching performance assessments: Teacher Credentialing Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44299 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44320.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |