CA AB2045 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 13 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 42, 109, 110, 122, 679.70, 1307, 1371, 1390, 1668, 1668.5, 1669, 1753, 4052, 10168.45, 10270, 10270.6, and 11401 of, and to repeal Section 12147 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Assembly - AB 2045 INS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By DALY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2045 INS. (Daly) By Glazer (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2045 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4899.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2018-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code10113.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10168.45Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10202Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10202.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10202.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10270Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10270.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code109Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code110Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code11401Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code12147Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code122Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1307Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1371Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1390Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1668Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1668.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1669Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1753Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code4052Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code42Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code679.70Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback