CA AB2041 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.75 and 23675 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: qualified employees.
Sponsors
Asm. Megan Dahle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.75 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23675 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2041 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2041 |