CA AB2040 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 894, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 894, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12463 and 53892 of, and to add Article 10.5 (commencing with Section 53908) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Compensation of elected officials, officers, and employees: reporting and disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2040 GARCIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2040 Garcia By Cannella (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2040 GARCIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2040 Garcia By Cannella (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2040 GARCIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 894, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6100.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4467.). |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5261.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12463 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53892 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53908 | New Code | See Bill Text |