CA AB2035 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17053.73 and 23626 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Taxation: credits: California New Employment Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23626 | Amended Code | Citation Text |