CA AB2033 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
Pending: Assembly Aging And Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
Pending: Assembly Aging And Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1771 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to continuing retirement communities.
Title
Continuing care contracts: repayable contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and HUM. S. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1771 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2033 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2033 |