CA AB203 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53300 and 53302 of, and to add Sections 53300.5, 53304, and 53305 to, the Education Code, relating to school intervention.
Title
Public schools: parent empowerment: school intervention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Assembly - AB 203 BROWNLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB203 Brownley By Lowenthal (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 203 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB203 Brownley By Lowenthal (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 203 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-09-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 3232.). | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2385.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 1642.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-22 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-01-28 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | |
2011-01-27 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 53300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53300.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 53301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 53305 | New Code | See Bill Text |