CA AB2019 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11300, 11302, and 46146.5 of, and to add Section 11303 to, the Education Code, relating to school attendance.
Title
Early and middle college high schools and programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 11300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 11302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 11303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 46146.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |