CA AB1991 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 116760.30 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Safe Drinking Water State Revolving Fund: Internet Web site information: updates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116760 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116760.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1991 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1991 |