CA AB1983 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 1 (commencing with Section 32200) to Chapter 2 of Part 19 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to school safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School safety: school facilities and emergency practices: security assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2018-01-31AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code32200New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code17560Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback