CA AB1983 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1 (commencing with Section 32200) to Chapter 2 of Part 19 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to school safety.
Title
School safety: school facilities and emergency practices: security assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 17560 | Amended Code | Citation Text |