CA AB1973 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.251 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.1961 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: abortion services: cost sharing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.251 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.1961 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1973 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1973 |