CA AB1962 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 567, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 567, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.004 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10112.26 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Dental plans: medical loss ratios: reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1962 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1962 Skinner By Hernandez (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1962 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1962 Skinner By Hernandez (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1962 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 567, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6362.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 4727.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5258.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (April 8). |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.004 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |