CA AB1958 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 33415 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: silencers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 33415 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1958 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1958 |